IN SB0581 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires oral or written consent by a pregnant woman to have HIV testing to be documented in the pregnant woman's medical chart instead of requiring a written statement of consent. Requires a committee to study issues concerning the current laws that require a person's consent before HIV testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIV testing of pregnant women.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Welch), prevailed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 112
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-19 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 387: yeas 48, nays 0
2011-04-14 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 454: yeas 89, nays 1
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (Welch), prevailed; Roll Call 415: yeas 90, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2011-02-17 Cosponsor: Rep. Welch
2011-02-17 House sponsor: Rep. Crouch
2011-02-17 Referred to the House
2011-02-17 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 50 and nays 0
2011-02-15 Amendment 1 (Becker), prevailed;
2011-02-15 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-10 Senator Breaux added as coauthor
2011-02-10 Senator Leising added as second author
2011-02-10 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-20 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2011-01-20 Authored by Senator Becker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0581
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0581.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0581.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0581.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0581.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0581.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SE/SE0581.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0166.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0415.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0454.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0387.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback