IN SB0578 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds Ivy Tech Community College, University of Southern Indiana, and Vincennes University to the law governing the sale of real estate by other state educational institutions. Provides for budget committee review before an agreement between a state educational institution and a third party may be entered into if the agreement is to monetize a capital asset and the agreement has an annual transactional value that exceeds $1,000,000, a total transactional value that exceeds $5,000,000, or a term, including the initial term and any renewal terms, that exceeds 10 years.
Title
State higher education institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |