IN SB0568 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Representative Klinker added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Tippecanoe County superior court. Adds a superior court in Tippecanoe County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tippecanoe County superior court. Adds a superior court in Tippecanoe County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-05SenateCosponsors: Representatives Negele and Brown, T.
2019-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehe
2019-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senators Buchanan and Alting

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/568/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/9/d/1f9df674/SB0568.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/5/b/c15b5d70/SB0568.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/e/8/9fe8fda5/SB0568.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/c/1/77c18054/SB0568.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/0/d/8d0d5bc0/SB0568.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/0/b/3d0b86cd/SB0568.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/8/b/ae8b14c7/SB0568.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/3/7/9e372eab/SB0568.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/2/6/0f261381/SB0568.86.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/3/f/273ff711/SB0568.03.COMS.01.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback