IN SB0567 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Distressed and fiscally impaired political subdivisions. Changes the membership of the distressed unit appeal board (DUAB) by replacing the voting member who is appointed by the chairperson of the legislative council with a member appointed by the governor and adding three nonvoting legislative members. Adds to and modifies the duties and powers of the DUAB. Designates the Gary Community School Corporation as a distressed political subdivision. Specifies the powers and duties of the emergency manager appointed for the Gary Community School Corporation. Establishes the fiscal management board for the Gary Community School Corporation, and provides that the fiscal management board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distressed and fiscally impaired political subdivisions. Changes the membership of the distressed unit appeal board (DUAB) by replacing the voting member who is appointed by the chairperson of the legislative council with a member appointed by the governor and adding three nonvoting legislative members. Adds to and modifies the duties and powers of the DUAB. Designates the Gary Community School Corporation as a distressed political subdivision. Specifies the powers and duties of the emergency manager appointed for the Gary Community School Corporation. Establishes the fiscal management board for the Gary Community School Corporation, and provides that the fiscal management board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Amendment #8 (Smith V) failed (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Brown C) failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Brown C) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Pryor) failed (Y: 30 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 241
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 546: yeas 88, nays 10
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 522: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-13SenateSenator Eckerty added as advisor
2017-04-12HouseHouse advisors appointed: Braun, Karickhoff, Behning, Brown C, Errington, Smith V and Wright
2017-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Lanane and Buck
2017-04-12HouseHouse conferees appointed: Brown T and Bauer
2017-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Kenley and Melton
2017-04-12SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-12SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 77, nays 19
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #8 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 400: yeas 26, nays 62
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #7 (Smith V) failed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #6 (Smith V) failed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #5 (Smith V) failed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #1 (Brown C) failed; Roll Call 399: yeas 29, nays 63
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #2 (Brown C) prevailed; Roll Call 398: yeas 93, nays 0
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #3 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 397: yeas 30, nays 64
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-06HouseRepresentative Behning added as cosponsor
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-15SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-13SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-13SenateCosponsors: Representatives Brown, C. and Smith, V.
2017-02-13SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Brown T
2017-02-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 101: yeas 49, nays 0
2017-02-09SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-06SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-02SenateSenators Charbonneau and Tallian added as coauthors
2017-01-26SenateSenator Melton added as second author
2017-01-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-18SenateAuthored by Senator Kenley

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/567/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/0/c/260cf63a/SB0567.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/e/f/70efae46/SB0567.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/1/1/82119954/SB0567.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/6/1/e1611a54/SB0567.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/1/5/a11572ad/SB0567.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/9/b/7f9b5efd/SB0567.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/f/5/cff50c44/SB0567.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/2/3/352397bb/SB0567.05.ENRH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/a/9/daa93e01/SB0567.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/8/9/1e89f904/SB0567.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/a/8/d6a8a34a/SB0567.101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/0/9/2709e4aa/SB0567.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/5/9/7e59b7d2/SB0567.397.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/b/c/96bcbdd3/SB0567.398.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/a/1/cea15e02/SB0567.399.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/b/0/4fb0bdc9/SB0567.400.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/6/c/a16c798c/SB0567.422.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/4/d/9f4dd265/SB0567.522.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/3/d/013d5427/SB0567.546.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback