IN SB0567 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redevelopment commissions and authorities. Requires a redevelopment commission or redevelopment authority to hold an organizational meeting on a day that is not a Saturday, a Sunday, or a legal holiday and that is their first meeting day of the year. Provides that the fiscal officer of a redevelopment commission may disburse funds only after the disbursement is approved by the redevelopment commission. Allows a redevelopment commission to specify types of disbursements that the fiscal officer may make in advance of the commission's approval at its next regular meeting. Requires the treasurer of a redevelopment commission to report annually to the
Title
Redevelopment commissions and authorities. Requires a redevelopment commission or redevelopment authority to hold an organizational meeting on a day that is not a Saturday, a Sunday, or a legal holiday and that is their first meeting day of the year. Provides that the fiscal officer of a redevelopment commission may disburse funds only after the disbursement is approved by the redevelopment commission. Allows a redevelopment commission to specify types of disbursements that the fiscal officer may make in advance of the commission's approval at its next regular meeting. Requires the treasurer of a redevelopment commission to report annually to the
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] |
Rep. Sue Errington [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 87 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 478: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 403: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-07 | House | Representative Errington added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as third author |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Truitt added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Broden added as second author |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Pete |