IN SB0567 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the data division of the state police department to notify the Indiana criminal justice institute if a public official or agency dealing with crime or criminals fails to comply with its statutory reporting duties. Permits the Indiana criminal justice institute to withhold certain funds from a public official or agency that has failed to comply with its reporting requirements, and permits the institute to reinstate withheld funds if the public official or agency complies with reporting requirements within six months of the funds being withheld.
Title
Uniform crime reporting system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 35 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Kubacki |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Bacon |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second author |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Wyss |