IN SB0561 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Indiana 2016 Bicentennial Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana 2016 Bicentennial Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 198
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 481: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-11SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 394: yeas 95, nays 0
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 1 (Washburne), withdrawn
2013-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-28HouseRepresentatives C. Brown and Arnold added as cosponsors
2013-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-18HouseRepresentative Stemler added as cosponsor
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
2013-02-05SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2013-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Huston
2013-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-02-04SenateSenator Buck added as second author
2013-02-04SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2013-02-04SenateSenator Taylor added as coauthor
2013-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback