IN SB0559 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Fraud.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fraud.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 438 (Y: 31 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 197
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 491: yeas 44, nays 1
2013-04-16SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 499: yeas 92, nays 0
2013-04-11HouseAmendment 2 (Davisson), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-11HouseAmendment 3 (DeLaney), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-11HouseReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-09HouseMotion to recommit to Committee on Judiciary (Bauer) failed; Roll Call 438: yeas 31, nays 65
2013-04-09HouseMotion to make a special order of business for April 11 (Pelath) failed; voice vote
2013-04-09HouseAmendment 1 (Turner), withdrawn
2013-04-09HouseSecond reading: call withdrawn
2013-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-02-26SenateCosponsor: Rep. Truitt
2013-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Turner
2013-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 43 and nays 7
2013-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-19SenateSenators Holdman and Pat Miller added as coauthors
2013-01-31SenateCommittee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2013-01-28SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2013-01-24SenateSenator Mishler added as second author
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0559
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0559.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0559.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0559.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0559.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0559.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0559.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0559.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0245.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0438.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0499.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0491.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback