IN SB0559 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies certain definitions and defenses that apply to the crime of conflict of interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conflict of interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 110
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-27 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 480: yeas 49, nays 0
2011-04-25 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-21 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 628: yeas 93, nays 1
2011-04-20 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-18 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2011-02-22 Cosponsor: Rep. Grubb
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. Koch
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 209: yeas 48 and nays 0
2011-02-21 Senator Head added as second author
2011-02-17 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-15 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-20 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-20 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback