IN SB0558 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 266
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Leases and sales of real property. Amends the statute concerning landlord and tenant relations to provide that a unit may not regulate rental rates for privately owned real property, through a zoning ordinance or otherwise, unless the regulation is authorized by an act of the general assembly. (Current law provides that regulation of rental rates for such property must be authorized by an act of the general assembly.) Prohibits a political subdivision from imposing certain penalties against a tenant, an owner, or a landlord for a contact made to request law enforcement or other emergency assistance for one or more

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leases and sales of real property. Amends the statute concerning landlord and tenant relations to provide that a unit may not regulate rental rates for privately owned real property, through a zoning ordinance or otherwise, unless the regulation is authorized by an act of the general assembly. (Current law provides that regulation of rental rates for such property must be authorized by an act of the general assembly.) Prohibits a political subdivision from imposing certain penalties against a tenant, an owner, or a landlord for a contact made to request law enforcement or other emergency assistance for one or more

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenatePublic Law 266
2017-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-11SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 459: yeas 28, nays 20
2017-04-10SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 421: yeas 77, nays 20
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #3 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn voice vote
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #4 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn voice vote
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #1 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #2 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-21HouseRepresentative Austin added as cosponsor
2017-03-09HouseRepresentative Speedy added as cosponsor
2017-03-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-17SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Eberhart
2017-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 29, nays 19
2017-02-13SenateAmendment #2 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2017-02-13SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-13SenateAmendment #3 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-13SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-06SenateSenator Buck added as second author
2017-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2017-01-18SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/558/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/8/5/0e85ecfe/SB0558.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/b/e/9ebe6431/SB0558.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/8/1/8c811c21/SB0558.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/9/9/e999a671/SB0558.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/8/9/ec8943e3/SB0558.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/b/7/74b70123/SB0558.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/8/a/4d8a4519/SB0558.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/2/a/c52aeee8/SB0558.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/5/a/335a2b49/SB0558.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/e/c/ebecc255/SB0558.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/2/b/822bc8fa/SB0558.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/a/8/81a8426f/SB0558.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/d/5/8ed5076d/SB0558.136.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/b/6/49b66ba1/SB0558.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/3/6/a536707e/SB0558.421.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/e/0/58e0a3b2/SB0558.459.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback