IN SB0558 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revises the law on the registration of land surveyors to provide instead for the registration of "professional surveyors". Revises the law on the certification of registered land surveyors in training to provide instead for the certification of "surveyor interns". Provides a new definition of "the practice of surveying" in recognition of technical changes in the practice. Defines "authoritative" when used to describe products, processes, applications, or data resulting from the practice of surveying. Provides that photogrammetrists must be certified by a national scientific organization. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land surveyors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 57
2013-04-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-25HouseRepresentative Moseley added as cosponsor
2013-03-25HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-03-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 334: yeas 93, nays 1
2013-03-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-19HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2013-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Ober
2013-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 42 and nays 7
2013-02-11SenateAmendment 1 (M. Young), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-07SenateSenator Buck added as second author
2013-02-07SenateSenator Taylor added as third author
2013-02-05SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator M. Young

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback