IN SB0556 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 164: yeas 20, nays 19
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Annexation. With regard to an annexation ordinance adopted after June 30, 2019, allows a county executive to review and deny an annexation if, for the assessment date in the calendar year preceding the calendar year in which the annexation ordinance is adopted, the total gross assessed value of all property annexed by the municipality by all ordinances adopted on the same date is more than 5% of the total gross assessed value of the municipality (without considering the territory to be annexed in the ordinance or ordinances). Provides that if the county executive: (1) denies the annexation, the proceedings are terminated; or (2) does not deny the annexation, the annexation proceedings continue. With regard to an annexation ordinance adopted after June 30, 2019: (1) requires the county executive to review; and (2) allows the county executive to deny an annexation, if, for the assessment date in the calendar year preceding the calendar year in which the annexation ordinance is adopted, the total gross assessed value of all property annexed by the municipality by all ordinances adopted during the calendar year is more than 15% of the total assessed value of the municipality (without considering the territory to be annexed in the ordinance or ordinances). Provides that if the county executive: (1) denies the annexation, the proceedings are terminated and all annexation ordinances adopted by a municipality during the calendar year are void; or (2) does not deny the annexation, the annexation proceedings continue. Requires a fiscal plan prepared after June 30, 2019, to address any estimated effects of the annexation on taxing units not included in the annexation. Requires after June 30, 2019, that notice be given of certain annexation proceedings to taxing units and political subdivisions evaluated for purposes of the fiscal plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation. With regard to an annexation ordinance adopted after June 30, 2019, allows a county executive to review and deny an annexation if, for the assessment date in the calendar year preceding the calendar year in which the annexation ordinance is adopted, the total gross assessed value of all property annexed by the municipality by all ordinances adopted on the same date is more than 5% of the total gross assessed value of the municipality (without considering the territory to be annexed in the ordinance or ordinances). Provides that if the county executive: (1) denies the annexation, the proceedings are terminated; or (2) does not deny the annexation, the annexation proceedings continue. With regard to an annexation ordinance adopted after June 30, 2019: (1) requires the county executive to review; and (2) allows the county executive to deny an annexation, if, for the assessment date in the calendar year preceding the calendar year in which the annexation ordinance is adopted, the total gross assessed value of all property annexed by the municipality by all ordinances adopted during the calendar year is more than 15% of the total assessed value of the municipality (without considering the territory to be annexed in the ordinance or ordinances). Provides that if the county executive: (1) denies the annexation, the proceedings are terminated and all annexation ordinances adopted by a municipality during the calendar year are void; or (2) does not deny the annexation, the annexation proceedings continue. Requires a fiscal plan prepared after June 30, 2019, to address any estimated effects of the annexation on taxing units not included in the annexation. Requires after June 30, 2019, that notice be given of certain annexation proceedings to taxing units and political subdivisions evaluated for purposes of the fiscal plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateThird reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 164: yeas 20, nays 19
2019-02-18SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateAmendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-12SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-11SenateSenator Boots added as second author
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Buck

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback