IN SB0553 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Right to use Lake Michigan shore for recreation. Defines "Lake Michigan shore" as the land along the edge of Lake Michigan between the water's edge and the ordinary high water mark. Provides that the Lake Michigan shore is held in trust by the state of Indiana for the use of the public. Provides that the department of natural resources (department) has: (1) jurisdiction over the Lake Michigan shore; and (2) the duty to protect the public's exercise of vested public rights in the Lake Michigan shore. Provides that the construction of structures that may extend onto the Lake Michigan shore is subject to regulation and permitting by the department. Provides that the public of Indiana has a vested right to use the Lake Michigan shore for certain recreational activities. Provides that the public of Indiana does not have a right to use the Lake Michigan shore to engage in an activity that: (1) constitutes a public nuisance; or (2) interferes with the exercise by other members of the public of their right to engage in the recreational activities that the public has a right to engage in. Authorizes the department to delegate concurrent authority to a unit of local government to regulate and enforce the right of the public to use the Lake Michigan shore for recreational activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to use Lake Michigan shore for recreation. Defines "Lake Michigan shore" as the land along the edge of Lake Michigan between the water's edge and the ordinary high water mark. Provides that the Lake Michigan shore is held in trust by the state of Indiana for the use of the public. Provides that the department of natural resources (department) has: (1) jurisdiction over the Lake Michigan shore; and (2) the duty to protect the public's exercise of vested public rights in the Lake Michigan shore. Provides that the construction of structures that may extend onto the Lake Michigan shore is subject to regulation and permitting by the department. Provides that the public of Indiana has a vested right to use the Lake Michigan shore for certain recreational activities. Provides that the public of Indiana does not have a right to use the Lake Michigan shore to engage in an activity that: (1) constitutes a public nuisance; or (2) interferes with the exercise by other members of the public of their right to engage in the recreational activities that the public has a right to engage in. Authorizes the department to delegate concurrent authority to a unit of local government to regulate and enforce the right of the public to use the Lake Michigan shore for recreational activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-25SenateCosponsor: Representative Wolkins
2019-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Eberhart
2019-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 32, nays 16
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #4 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-18SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-02-14SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-14SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Tallian

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback