IN SB0553 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Defines "vision screening" for the testing of certain students. Specifies that modified clinical technique vision tests for students must be performed by a licensed ophthalmologist or optometrist. Sets forth standards for vision tests. Modifies reporting requirements for the results of vision tests and waivers of vision tests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vision testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 89
2013-04-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 465: yeas 49, nays 0
2013-04-05SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 393: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-03-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2013-02-04SenateSenator Leising added as second author
2013-02-04SenateSenator Leising removed as coauthor
2013-01-31SenateCosponsors: Reps. Crouch, Bacon and Riecken
2013-01-31SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Clere
2013-01-31SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-31SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-01-29SenateAmendment 1 (Becker), prevailed; voice vote
2013-01-29SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-24SenateSenators Leising and Breaux added as coauthors
2013-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Becker

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback