IN SB0551 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Federal health care reform.
Title
Federal health care reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-03-04 | House | Representative T. Brown added as cosponsor |
2013-03-04 | House | Representative Clere added as sponsor |
2013-03-04 | House | Representative Clere removed as cosponsor |
2013-03-04 | House | Representative T. Brown removed as sponsor |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Clere, Lehman and C. Brown |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 44 and nays 6 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Tallian), rejected; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as third author |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second author |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pat Miller |