IN SB0547 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Study of education matters. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate study committee the topics of: (1) improving science education; (2) improving mathematics, geography, and personal finance education in kindergarten through grade 12; and (3) including entrepreneurship curriculum in kindergarten through grade 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study of education matters. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate study committee the topics of: (1) improving science education; (2) improving mathematics, geography, and personal finance education in kindergarten through grade 12; and (3) including entrepreneurship curriculum in kindergarten through grade 12.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsor: Representative Cook
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Behning
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Spartz

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback