IN SB0547 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senator Alting added as third author
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senator Alting added as third author
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans and courts. Provides that a problem solving court that is a veteran's court and the services of the court are available to veterans who are convicted of a misdemeanor or felony in another court in another county. Provides that the Indiana judicial center shall establish at least one problem solving court that is a veteran's court in each of the judicial districts. Requires the board of directors of the judicial conference of Indiana to adopt rules prescribing how courts and counties shall cooperate with one another concerning a veteran under the jurisdiction of a veteran's court in a different
Title
Veterans and courts. Provides that a problem solving court that is a veteran's court and the services of the court are available to veterans who are convicted of a misdemeanor or felony in another court in another county. Provides that the Indiana judicial center shall establish at least one problem solving court that is a veteran's court in each of the judicial districts. Requires the board of directors of the judicial conference of Indiana to adopt rules prescribing how courts and counties shall cooperate with one another concerning a veteran under the jurisdiction of a veteran's court in a different
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Alting added as third author |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senators Zakas and Crider |