IN SB0545 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Representative DeLaney added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax collection by remote sellers. Provides that a retail merchant that does not have a physical presence in Indiana shall, as an agent for the state, collect sales tax on a retail transaction made in Indiana, remit the sales tax, and comply with all applicable procedures and requirements of the sales tax laws as if the retail merchant has a physical presence in Indiana, if: (1) the retail merchant's gross revenue from sales into Indiana in a calendar year exceeds $100,000; or (2) the retail merchant makes sales into Indiana in more than 200 separate transactions. Authorizes the department

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax collection by remote sellers. Provides that a retail merchant that does not have a physical presence in Indiana shall, as an agent for the state, collect sales tax on a retail transaction made in Indiana, remit the sales tax, and comply with all applicable procedures and requirements of the sales tax laws as if the retail merchant has a physical presence in Indiana, if: (1) the retail merchant's gross revenue from sales into Indiana in a calendar year exceeds $100,000; or (2) the retail merchant makes sales into Indiana in more than 200 separate transactions. Authorizes the department

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-08SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-06SenateSenators Charbonneau and Tallian added as coauthors
2017-02-02SenateCosponsors: Representatives Huston and Goodin
2017-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smith M
2017-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 42, nays 1
2017-01-31SenateAmendment #2 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
2017-01-31SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-01-30SenatePlaced back on second reading
2017-01-30SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateSenator Hershman added as second author
2017-01-26SenateAmendment #1 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
2017-01-26SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2017-01-17SenateAuthored by Senator Kenley

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback