IN SB0544 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agency settlement fund. Requires the attorney general to include certain language concerning settlement funds in proposed court order language. Establishes the agency settlement fund (fund) for purposes of receiving certain funds paid to the state as part of a settlement or similar agreement. Provides for use of the money in the fund as approved and appropriated by the general assembly, or according to a court order that applies to the specific settlement or agreement.
Title
Agency settlement fund. Requires the attorney general to include certain language concerning settlement funds in proposed court order language. Establishes the agency settlement fund (fund) for purposes of receiving certain funds paid to the state as part of a settlement or similar agreement. Provides for use of the money in the fund as approved and appropriated by the general assembly, or according to a court order that applies to the specific settlement or agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 44, nays 4 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |