IN SB0535 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that if the fiscal body of Clark County establishes an airport authority with four members, one of the members shall be appointed by the legislative body of the town of Sellersburg and three members shall be appointed by the county executive of Clark County. Provides that the board of the airport authority may consist of five members if the county fiscal body adopts an ordinance or resolution under the provision in current law authorizing such a five member board. Provides that if the board of the airport authority consists of five members, three of the members of the board shall be appointed by the county executive of Clark County, one of the members of the board shall be appointed by the fiscal body of Clark County, and one of the members of the board shall be appointed by the legislative body of the town of Sellersburg. Specifies, however, that the individuals serving as members of the Clark County board of aviation commissioners at the time the airport authority is established shall become the initial members of the board of the airport authority. Provides that if the fiscal body of Clark County establishes an airport authority: (1) the airport authority shall be named the South Central Regional Airport Authority; and (2) the airport authority's budget, tax levies, and bonds or leases payable from property taxes must be approved by the Clark County fiscal body. Requires the board of the airport authority to maintain liability insurance coverage in an amount determined sufficient by the board. Requires the board of the airport authority to issue for each year an annual report that contains certain elements and to present the annual report at public hearings of the county executive of Clark County, the fiscal body of Clark County, and the legislative body of the town of Sellersburg.
Title
Airport authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 373 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate - Roll Call 239 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 373 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate - Roll Call 239 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 84 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 385: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 373: yeas 93, nays 4 |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment 1 (Stemler), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-28 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-26 | House | Representative Davisson added as cosponsor |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Clere and Goodin |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Stemler |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 3 (Smith), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Smith), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 5 (Grooms), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |