IN SB0534 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rules for prescribing controlled substances. Requires the medical licensing board to adopt standards and protocols for the prescribing of controlled substances, including the use of abuse deterrent formulations. Requires, before March 1, 2016, the following boards to adopt rules concerning the prescribing of opioid controlled substances for pain management treatment: (1) the medical licensing board, concerning physician assistants; (2) the board of podiatric medicine, concerning podiatrists; (3) the state board of dentistry, concerning dentists; and (4) the Indiana state board of nursing, concerning advanced practice nurses. Requires each board to report before December 31, 2015, to the legislative council with

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rules for prescribing controlled substances. Requires the medical licensing board to adopt standards and protocols for the prescribing of controlled substances, including the use of abuse deterrent formulations. Requires, before March 1, 2016, the following boards to adopt rules concerning the prescribing of opioid controlled substances for pain management treatment: (1) the medical licensing board, concerning physician assistants; (2) the board of podiatric medicine, concerning podiatrists; (3) the state board of dentistry, concerning dentists; and (4) the Indiana state board of nursing, concerning advanced practice nurses. Requires each board to report before December 31, 2015, to the legislative council with

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23SenatePublic Law 54
2015-04-23SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-31SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 366: yeas 48, nays 1
2015-03-27SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-03-25HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-03-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 327: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-03-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-12HouseRepresentative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2015-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-17SenateRepresentatives Clere and Stemler added as cosponsors
2015-02-17SenateRepresentative Davisson added as sponsor
2015-02-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-02-16SenateSenator Miller, Pat added as second author
2015-02-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Grooms

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/534/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/f/e/c7fea7cc/SB0534.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/5/b/a75b3b37/SB0534.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/a/6/a3a605a7/SB0534.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/4/9/3049443a/SB0534.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/e/8/f2e8ed6b/SB0534.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/4/4/e544f7d5/SB0534.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/5/b/705bfac5/SB0534.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/d/b/1fdbff3f/SB0534.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/f/7/fff71703/SB0534.181.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/b/9/b3b9950d/SB0534.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/f/f/84ff6e4d/SB0534.327.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/7/c/eb7cff87/SB0534.366.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback