IN SB0533 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Importation of domestic animals from abroad. Provides that any person who transfers a domestic dog or cat from a foreign country into Indiana shall provide the recipient of the domestic dog or cat with a copy of the domestic dog's or cat's certificate of veterinary inspection or official health certificate. Provides that a person who receives a domestic dog or cat that is imported from a foreign country into Indiana shall submit to the state board of animal health a copy of the domestic dog's or cat's certificate of veterinary inspection or official health certificate not more than 30 days after receiving the domestic dog or cat. Permits a person to provide or submit an electronic copy of a domestic dog's or cat's certificate of veterinary inspection or official health certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Importation of domestic animals from abroad. Provides that any person who transfers a domestic dog or cat from a foreign country into Indiana shall provide the recipient of the domestic dog or cat with a copy of the domestic dog's or cat's certificate of veterinary inspection or official health certificate. Provides that a person who receives a domestic dog or cat that is imported from a foreign country into Indiana shall submit to the state board of animal health a copy of the domestic dog's or cat's certificate of veterinary inspection or official health certificate not more than 30 days after receiving the domestic dog or cat. Permits a person to provide or submit an electronic copy of a domestic dog's or cat's certificate of veterinary inspection or official health certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePublic Law 39
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 374: yeas 95, nays 2
2019-03-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-25SenateCosponsor: Representative Gutwein
2019-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehe
2019-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-18SenateSenators Glick and Tomes added as coauthors
2019-02-18SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2019-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/533/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/7/1/af7160c8/SB0533.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/2/2/7122e1e8/SB0533.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/5/e/ec5e6562/SB0533.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/d/7/7cd7c4ec/SB0533.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/d/e/fedeeeb1/SB0533.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/a/8/62a8503f/SB0533.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/e/0/0ae015c7/SB0533.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/8/5/178556cf/SB0533.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/c/5/dbc52ac3/SB0533.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/3/8/3c3846f1/SB0533.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/e/5/e3e5d448/SB0533.199.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/a/6/4ea6881b/SB0533.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/9/f/a49f94ce/SB0533.374.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback