IN SB0532 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Service of process fees. Makes the clerk responsible for collecting service of process fees. Raises the service of process fee from $13 to $28. Reinstates the prohibition on collection of service of process fees more than one time in a case. Specifies that $3 of each service of process fee shall be distributed, by the county auditor, to the clerk's record perpetuation fund. Makes conforming technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Service of process fees. Makes the clerk responsible for collecting service of process fees. Raises the service of process fee from $13 to $28. Reinstates the prohibition on collection of service of process fees more than one time in a case. Specifies that $3 of each service of process fee shall be distributed, by the county auditor, to the clerk's record perpetuation fund. Makes conforming technical amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Sandlin added as third author
2017-02-28SenateSenator Walker added as second author
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Mahan
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-02-21SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-13SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2017-01-17SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/532/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/0/3/eb030ae1/SB0532.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/3/0/2730f873/SB0532.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/4/7/fe47a01a/SB0532.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/8/6/16860451/SB0532.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/9/6/c996b002/SB0532.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/a/3/58a33ed3/SB0532.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/5/1/b751f1a4/SB0532.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/c/7/40c748b4/SB0532.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/2/5/19257082/SB0532.05.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/d/3/0ed3c957/SB0532.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/0/9/57094d27/SB0532.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/5/4/7c54351f/SB0532.242.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/1/2/6512d102/SB0532.04.ENGS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback