IN SB0524 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax deeds and conveyance documents. Provides that when a county auditor sends out certain notices for a tax sale by certified mail, the notices must be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested. Requires that a verified petition for a tax deed to real property acquired in a tax sale must include copies of various notices sent by the petitioner, copies of certified mail mailing receipts, copies of certified mail return receipts, returned mailing envelopes, and evidence used by the petitioner to ascertain the owner of property and any other persons with a substantial property interest of public record in

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax deeds and conveyance documents. Provides that when a county auditor sends out certain notices for a tax sale by certified mail, the notices must be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested. Requires that a verified petition for a tax deed to real property acquired in a tax sale must include copies of various notices sent by the petitioner, copies of certified mail mailing receipts, copies of certified mail return receipts, returned mailing envelopes, and evidence used by the petitioner to ascertain the owner of property and any other persons with a substantial property interest of public record in

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 236
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2015-04-29HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2015-04-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 494: yeas 45, nays 0
2015-04-16SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 441: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-04-13HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor
2015-04-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-10SenateRepresentative Steuerwald added as sponsor
2015-02-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-02-09SenateAmendment #1 (Zakas) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-05SenateSenator Taylor added as coauthor
2015-02-05SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-05SenateSenator Head added as second author
2015-02-03SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/524/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/2/2/562251be/SB0524.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/2/8/48283cbb/SB0524.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/5/e/af5e94ed/SB0524.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/2/c/772ced13/SB0524.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/c/1/28c14cbb/SB0524.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/7/6/31768805/SB0524.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/4/8/5a48fe73/SB0524.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/0/d/e30d281f/SB0524.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/7/1/be71a4b5/SB0524.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/0/1/8b01e361/SB0524.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/0/4/4e04fddb/SB0524.136.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/7/1/78718619/SB0524.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/e/c/0cecc0ac/SB0524.441.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/4/4/6244fb2f/SB0524.494.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback