IN SB0523 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 259
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 259
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Off-road vehicles and snowmobiles.
Title
Off-road vehicles and snowmobiles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 259 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 488: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-19 | House | Representatives Lehman and Kersey added as cosponsors |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 93, nays 4 |
2013-03-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2013-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Eberhart |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |