IN SB0522 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 235
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Serious sex offenders. Defines "serious sex offender". Makes entry on school property by a serious sex offender a Level 6 felony. Provides that a serious sex offender is entitled to vote by mail. Requires the department of correction to inform a serious sex offender at the time of discharge from the department: (1) that a serious sex offender who knowingly or intentionally enters school property commits unlawful entry by a serious sex offender, a Level 6 felony; and (2) of voting options for the serious sex offender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Serious sex offenders. Defines "serious sex offender". Makes entry on school property by a serious sex offender a Level 6 felony. Provides that a serious sex offender is entitled to vote by mail. Requires the department of correction to inform a serious sex offender at the time of discharge from the department: (1) that a serious sex offender who knowingly or intentionally enters school property commits unlawful entry by a serious sex offender, a Level 6 felony; and (2) of voting options for the serious sex offender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 235
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-06HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2015-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 364: yeas 90, nays 0
2015-03-31HouseRepresentatives Olthoff and Fine added as cosponsors
2015-03-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-26HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-17HouseRepresentative Hale added as cosponsor
2015-03-12HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-19SenateSenator Miller, Pat added as coauthor
2015-02-19SenateRepresentative Smaltz added as sponsor
2015-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-02-17SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12SenateSenator Bray added as coauthor
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-05SenateSenator Lanane added as third author
2015-02-03SenateSenator Young, M. added as second author
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Mrvan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/522/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/d/3/52d3d97d/SB0522.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/2/a/002af078/SB0522.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/2/a/432a7e0f/SB0522.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/f/7/edf7f5e9/SB0522.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/2/8/69285ae5/SB0522.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/8/d/fe8ddc0e/SB0522.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/1/d/2c1d97ed/SB0522.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/3/1/0531a7d0/SB0522.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/6/e/186efee7/SB0522.190.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/1/7/1b17b98c/SB0522.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/2/a/812ac989/SB0522.364.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback