IN SB0518 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Various election law matters.
Title
Various election law matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Wesco), failed (Y: 26 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Moed), failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Bartlett), failed (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Wesco), failed (Y: 26 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Moed), failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Bartlett), failed (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Lanane), failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 194 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 480: yeas 36, nays 12 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 392: yeas 64, nays 30 |
2013-04-01 | House | Amendment 2 (Wesco), withdrawn |
2013-04-01 | House | Amendment 3 (Wesco), failed; Roll Call 382: yeas 26, nays 64 |
2013-04-01 | House | Amendment 1 (Moed), failed; Roll Call 381: yeas 31, nays 62 |
2013-04-01 | House | Amendment 5 (Bartlett), failed; Roll Call 380: yeas 30, nays 62 |
2013-04-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. M. Smith |
2013-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Richardson |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 35 and nays 13 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as second author |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment 3 (Lanane), rejected; voice vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Lanane), rejected; Roll Call 82: yeas 13, nays 36 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Landske |