IN SB0517 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Distribution of lottery revenue for veterans' purposes. Provides that from January 1, 2018, through June 30, 2020, the state lottery commission shall, before the last business day of January, April, July, and October of each year, transfer $125,000 of the surplus lottery revenue to the treasurer of state for deposit in a grant account established within the veterans' affairs trust fund. Authorizes the Indiana veterans' affairs commission to use money in the grant account to make grants to be used for the purpose of providing services to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribution of lottery revenue for veterans' purposes. Provides that from January 1, 2018, through June 30, 2020, the state lottery commission shall, before the last business day of January, April, July, and October of each year, transfer $125,000 of the surplus lottery revenue to the treasurer of state for deposit in a grant account established within the veterans' affairs trust fund. Authorizes the Indiana veterans' affairs commission to use money in the grant account to make grants to be used for the purpose of providing services to veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-03-01SenateSenators Tomes, Glick, Charbonneau added as coauthors
2017-02-28SenateSenators Young M and Buck added as coauthors
2017-02-28SenateCosponsors: Representatives Judy and Lawson
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-21SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2017-02-21SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
2017-01-17SenateCoauthored by Senators Ford, Doriot, Crider, Niemeyer, Sandlin, Niezgodski, Melton and Mrvan
2017-01-17SenateAuthored by Senators Alting, Delph and Merritt

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/517/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/d/3/b8d3989d/SB0517.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/d/f/eadf5d36/SB0517.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/4/2/a942fbec/SB0517.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/3/8/44384a7b/SB0517.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/2/0/87201140/SB0517.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/8/c/658ca6a8/SB0517.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/7/c/847c9774/SB0517.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/b/d/f2bd7057/SB0517.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/f/a/b7fa5ced/SB0517.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/3/4/b634765a/SB0517.241.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback