IN SB0516 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 240
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Power of guardian to request health records. Provides that, even though a guardianship terminates upon the death of the protected person, a guardian is authorized to request the health records of the protected person within 60 days after the protected person's death if the protected person was an incapacitated person. Provides, however, that a guardian may not request the health records of the protected person after the protected person's death if a personal representative of the estate of the protected person is appointed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Power of guardian to request health records. Provides that, even though a guardianship terminates upon the death of the protected person, a guardian is authorized to request the health records of the protected person within 60 days after the protected person's death if the protected person was an incapacitated person. Provides, however, that a guardian may not request the health records of the protected person after the protected person's death if a personal representative of the estate of the protected person is appointed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 240
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 503: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 531: yeas 97, nays 0
2017-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Koch and Taylor G
2017-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bray and Breaux
2017-04-11SenateSenator Koch added as third author
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: May and Bauer
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Washburne and Shackleford
2017-04-10SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-10SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 420: yeas 97, nays 0
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-21SenateCosponsors: Representatives Clere and Beumer
2017-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Shackleford
2017-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 48, nays 0
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-16SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-02-02SenateSenator Bray added as second author
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2017-01-17SenateAuthored by Senator Breaux

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/516/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/f/5/90f5a94a/SB0516.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/3/b/d33b148d/SB0516.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/4/d/bc4d806b/SB0516.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/0/9/2d09d491/SB0516.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/3/3/9b33aae3/SB0516.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/2/d/f32d44b2/SB0516.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/5/5/7c556aa2/SB0516.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/6/6/c86668c7/SB0516.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/6/2/0862c6a4/SB0516.170.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/3/0/6230bb92/SB0516.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/d/a/9eda8b14/SB0516.420.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/3/d/e63dfe48/SB0516.503.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/a/3/a7a31326/SB0516.531.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback