IN SB0513 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Grants from state disaster relief fund. Provides that the maximum amount that an individual may receive from the state disaster relief fund (fund) as compensation for damages to the individual's property is $10,000. (Current administrative rules provide that the maximum amount is $5,000.) Voids provisions in the Indiana Administrative Code that set forth a maximum compensation amount of $5,000. Directs the department of homeland security to amend, before July 1, 2020, the administrative rule concerning the fund to reflect a maximum compensation amount of $10,000 for individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants from state disaster relief fund. Provides that the maximum amount that an individual may receive from the state disaster relief fund (fund) as compensation for damages to the individual's property is $10,000. (Current administrative rules provide that the maximum amount is $5,000.) Voids provisions in the Indiana Administrative Code that set forth a maximum compensation amount of $5,000. Directs the department of homeland security to amend, before July 1, 2020, the administrative rule concerning the fund to reflect a maximum compensation amount of $10,000 for individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenatePublic Law 70
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 373: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-03-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-26SenateCosponsors: Representatives Bauer, VanNatter and Karickhoff
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wolkins
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 46, nays 1
2019-02-25SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenator Brown L added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-14SenateSenators Niemeyer and Melton added as coauthors
2019-02-14SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Niezgodski

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/513/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/7/7/40774671/SB0513.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/b/1/fcb1a4af/SB0513.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/7/4/4474a1b1/SB0513.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/6/4/a264eb23/SB0513.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/7/0/0170e8ab/SB0513.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/b/4/deb4df18/SB0513.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/1/1/0f115cf2/SB0513.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/e/f/98ef8621/SB0513.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/3/f/e93f44df/SB0513.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/f/0/38f0f5fe/SB0513.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/2/6/9d26dbb5/SB0513.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/e/3/71e3aeb8/SB0513.241.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/4/6/81469a66/SB0513.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/6/d/826d8941/SB0513.373.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback