IN SB0512 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exemption from overtime pay. Provides that the requirement to pay an employee who works more than 40 hours in a work week at least 150% of the employee's regular rate for the overtime hours does not apply to an employee of an air carrier to the extent that the hours worked by the employee during a work week in excess of 40 hours are not required by the air carrier but are arranged through a voluntary agreement between employees to trade or reassign their scheduled work hours. Removes outdated language. Relocates language concerning the tip credit. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exemption from overtime pay. Provides that the requirement to pay an employee who works more than 40 hours in a work week at least 150% of the employee's regular rate for the overtime hours does not apply to an employee of an air carrier to the extent that the hours worked by the employee during a work week in excess of 40 hours are not required by the air carrier but are arranged through a voluntary agreement between employees to trade or reassign their scheduled work hours. Removes outdated language. Relocates language concerning the tip credit. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePublic Law 38
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 337: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-25SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-02-14SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-12SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateCosponsors: Representatives Morris, Beck and Deal
2019-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bacon
2019-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-02-11SenateSenator Spartz added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateSenators Ford J.D., Doriot, Walker, Perfect added as coauthors
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-31SenateSenator Boots added as second author
2019-01-31SenateSenator Boots removed as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Boots added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Niezgodski

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/512/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/4/a/0e4a870d/SB0512.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/b/7/f3b72c72/SB0512.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/e/e/16ee25a6/SB0512.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/c/0/63c0da96/SB0512.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/d/9/47d97bc1/SB0512.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/f/6/30f66af3/SB0512.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/a/3/0da3f860/SB0512.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/2/6/1f26379f/SB0512.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/9/b/e49b7e6a/SB0512.113.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/9/6/64961c6d/SB0512.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/9/3/ec93ab54/SB0512.329.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/a/e/83aed695/SB0512.337.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback