IN SB0510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substance abuse pilot program. Provides that Allen County may enter into an agreement with an entity to administer a substance abuse pilot program after approval of the Indiana commission to combat drug abuse (commission). Specifies that the entity that agrees to administer the pilot program: (1) may not expend state grants unless the administrator has raised at least $1 of local funds for every $1 of state funds before July 1, 2018; and (2) may not expend money granted to the administrator for the pilot program for a state fiscal year unless the administrator expends at least $1 of local
Title
Substance abuse pilot program. Provides that Allen County may enter into an agreement with an entity to administer a substance abuse pilot program after approval of the Indiana commission to combat drug abuse (commission). Specifies that the entity that agrees to administer the pilot program: (1) may not expend state grants unless the administrator has raised at least $1 of local funds for every $1 of state funds before July 1, 2018; and (2) may not expend money granted to the administrator for the pilot program for a state fiscal year unless the administrator expends at least $1 of local
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Law 175 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 479: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Representatives Zent, Brown, C., Shackleford added as cosponsors |
2017-03-28 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2017-03-07 | House | Representative Heine added as cosponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Davisson |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |