IN SB0510 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Amendment 19 (Lawson), prevailed; Roll Call 443: yeas 72, nays 22
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Amendment 19 (Lawson), prevailed; Roll Call 443: yeas 72, nays 22
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Substitute natural gas (SNG) contracts.
Title
Substitute natural gas (SNG) contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House - Roll Call 443 (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 442 (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate - Roll Call 236 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 442 (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate - Roll Call 236 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 19 (Lawson), prevailed; Roll Call 443: yeas 72, nays 22 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 23 (Clere), prevailed; Roll Call 442: yeas 87, nays 6 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 6 (Ubelhor), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 48, nays 42 |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Representatives Leonard, Braun and DeLaney added as cosponsors |
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Crouch |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 47 and nays 3 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senator Smith added as second author |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senator Smith removed as coauthor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Broden), rejected; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Lanane), rejected; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senators Skinner and Pete Miller added as coauthors |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau removed as coauthor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senators Head and Landske added as coauthors |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senators Boots, Banks, Charbonneau, Grooms, Holdman, Kruse, Leising, Schneider, Smith, Steele, Walker, Waltz, M. Young and Randolph added as coauthors |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Eckerty |