IN SB0509 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Scholarships and grants. Provides that at the end of each state fiscal year, the commission for higher education (commission) may order the auditor of state to transfer money among certain funds if the commission determines that the remaining appropriation in a particular fund could be used by eligible applicants for an award under one of the other funds in the following state fiscal year. Provides that the auditor of state shall make a transfer ordered by the commission. Provides that a student who applies for a twenty-first century scholars program tuition scholarship must certify in writing that the student complied

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Scholarships and grants. Provides that at the end of each state fiscal year, the commission for higher education (commission) may order the auditor of state to transfer money among certain funds if the commission determines that the remaining appropriation in a particular fund could be used by eligible applicants for an award under one of the other funds in the following state fiscal year. Provides that the auditor of state shall make a transfer ordered by the commission. Provides that a student who applies for a twenty-first century scholars program tuition scholarship must certify in writing that the student complied

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 234
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-23SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 500: yeas 48, nays 0
2015-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 523: yeas 89, nays 0
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Truitt, Huston and Smith V
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Clere and Klinker
2015-04-14SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Perfect, Stoops and Raatz
2015-04-14SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Rogers
2015-04-14SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-14SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-14SenateConcurrrence withdrawn
2015-04-13SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-10HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 391: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-04-07HouseAmendment #7 (Porter) failed; voice vote
2015-04-07HouseAmendment #2 (Truitt) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-07HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-02HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2015-03-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-17HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-17HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-24SenateRepresentative Truitt added as cosponsor
2015-02-24SenateRepresentative Clere added as sponsor
2015-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-02-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-16SenateSenator Rogers added as third author
2015-02-16SenateSenator Kenley added as second author
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/509/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/d/e/99de807e/SB0509.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/9/9/21996816/SB0509.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/5/d/925da076/SB0509.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/0/3/ad037480/SB0509.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/f/3/32f3b6de/SB0509.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/5/f/175ff5bf/SB0509.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/e/8/0fe85f81/SB0509.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/2/5/8825f6f6/SB0509.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/0/e/ee0ed1f1/SB0509.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/a/8/0ca8da29/SB0509.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/7/b/6d7b279b/SB0509.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/c/0/4cc00ea2/SB0509.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/e/4/84e49d7c/SB0509.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/6/4/c6646ada/SB0509.263.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/d/a/7cda4d1b/SB0509.03.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/1/d/161d6f03/SB0509.391.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/f/4/1af46ab5/SB0509.500.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/f/c/82fc5cbd/SB0509.523.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback