IN SB0508 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School employee training requirements. Requires the interim study committee on education to review teacher training requirements once every five years. Repeals and relocates school training provisions concerning the following: (1) Training concerning bullying prevention and reporting. (2) Training in the implementation of the criminal organization policy or addressing criminal activity at a school. (3) Training on child abuse and neglect. (4) Research based inservice youth suicide awareness and prevention training. (5) Inservice training pertaining to the identification and reporting of human trafficking. Provides that each school corporation and charter school shall require: (1) an applicant for employment who will have direct, ongoing contact with children within the scope of the applicant's employment to attend the training before or not later than 30 days after the start date of the applicant's employment; and (2) a school employee who has direct, ongoing contact with children within the scope of the employee's employment to attend the training once every five years. Provides for all the training: (1) the format options for the training; (2) that the training required must be during the school employee's contracted day or at a time chosen by the employee; and (3) that the training shall count toward the requirements for professional development required by the governing body of the school corporation or organizer of a charter school. Removes provisions that require certain accredited nonpublic school employees to attend training on child abuse and neglect, youth suicide awareness, and human trafficking. Removes a provision providing that a school corporation may leverage state and federal grants or free or reduced cost evidence based youth suicide awareness and prevention training provided by any state agency or qualified statewide or local organization to cover the costs of the youth suicide awareness and prevention training. Removes a provision that provides that the department of education may not issue an initial teaching license at any grade level to an applicant for an initial teaching license unless the applicant shows evidence that the applicant has successfully completed education and training on the prevention of child suicide and the recognition of signs that a student may be considering suicide. Provides that a school safety plan must, for school corporations and charter schools, include information regarding the content and implementation of the training requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School employee training requirements. Requires the interim study committee on education to review teacher training requirements once every five years. Repeals and relocates school training provisions concerning the following: (1) Training concerning bullying prevention and reporting. (2) Training in the implementation of the criminal organization policy or addressing criminal activity at a school. (3) Training on child abuse and neglect. (4) Research based inservice youth suicide awareness and prevention training. (5) Inservice training pertaining to the identification and reporting of human trafficking. Provides that each school corporation and charter school shall require: (1) an applicant for employment who will have direct, ongoing contact with children within the scope of the applicant's employment to attend the training before or not later than 30 days after the start date of the applicant's employment; and (2) a school employee who has direct, ongoing contact with children within the scope of the employee's employment to attend the training once every five years. Provides for all the training: (1) the format options for the training; (2) that the training required must be during the school employee's contracted day or at a time chosen by the employee; and (3) that the training shall count toward the requirements for professional development required by the governing body of the school corporation or organizer of a charter school. Removes provisions that require certain accredited nonpublic school employees to attend training on child abuse and neglect, youth suicide awareness, and human trafficking. Removes a provision providing that a school corporation may leverage state and federal grants or free or reduced cost evidence based youth suicide awareness and prevention training provided by any state agency or qualified statewide or local organization to cover the costs of the youth suicide awareness and prevention training. Removes a provision that provides that the department of education may not issue an initial teaching license at any grade level to an applicant for an initial teaching license unless the applicant shows evidence that the applicant has successfully completed education and training on the prevention of child suicide and the recognition of signs that a student may be considering suicide. Provides that a school safety plan must, for school corporations and charter schools, include information regarding the content and implementation of the training requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-18SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-14SenateSenator Spartz added as third author
2019-02-14SenateCosponsor: Representative Behning
2019-02-14SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2019-02-14SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-02-12SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateAmendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-12SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenatePlaced back on second reading
2019-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Raatz

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback