IN SB0507 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Provides that the state board of education (state board) may adopt and provide to schools: (1) an early warning system that provides actionable data on students as early as elementary school; and (2) a graduation pathways tracking and reporting system that provides actionable data on students. Provides that, if the state board enters into a contract with a vendor to provide an early warning system, the state board shall include in the contract a requirement that the vendor provide to the state board, at least quarterly, a statewide summary report concerning certain information. Provides that teacher evaluations must be conducted by a certified evaluator. Establishes requirements for a teacher evaluation model. Requires a school corporation to report certain data from the school corporation's teacher evaluation model. Requires the department of education to aggregate the data and provide the information to the commission for higher education (commission) and the state board not later than December 1 of each year. Requires the state board, working in conjunction with the commission, to analyze the data annually and publish findings and recommendations to inform the teacher preparation programs in Indiana. Allows the state board to establish criteria for renewal and initial teacher preparation program approvals based on the state board's findings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters. Provides that the state board of education (state board) may adopt and provide to schools: (1) an early warning system that provides actionable data on students as early as elementary school; and (2) a graduation pathways tracking and reporting system that provides actionable data on students. Provides that, if the state board enters into a contract with a vendor to provide an early warning system, the state board shall include in the contract a requirement that the vendor provide to the state board, at least quarterly, a statewide summary report concerning certain information. Provides that teacher evaluations must be conducted by a certified evaluator. Establishes requirements for a teacher evaluation model. Requires a school corporation to report certain data from the school corporation's teacher evaluation model. Requires the department of education to aggregate the data and provide the information to the commission for higher education (commission) and the state board not later than December 1 of each year. Requires the state board, working in conjunction with the commission, to analyze the data annually and publish findings and recommendations to inform the teacher preparation programs in Indiana. Allows the state board to establish criteria for renewal and initial teacher preparation program approvals based on the state board's findings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-19SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2019-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 40, nays 0
2019-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-07SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Raatz

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback