IN SB0507 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 237
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Economic development. Repeals the statute establishing the emerging technology grant fund. Repeals the statute that authorized the Indiana finance authority to issue bonds before July 1, 2011, for the Indiana twenty-first century research and technology fund. Repeals the Indiana regional city fund statute, and transfers the provisions in that statute to the Indiana regional cities development fund statute. Eliminates the strategic review committee under the regional cities program, and assigns its duties to the board of the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC). Authorizes the governor to appoint up to three additional members to the IEDC board. Eliminates the provision allowing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development. Repeals the statute establishing the emerging technology grant fund. Repeals the statute that authorized the Indiana finance authority to issue bonds before July 1, 2011, for the Indiana twenty-first century research and technology fund. Repeals the Indiana regional city fund statute, and transfers the provisions in that statute to the Indiana regional cities development fund statute. Eliminates the strategic review committee under the regional cities program, and assigns its duties to the board of the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC). Authorizes the governor to appoint up to three additional members to the IEDC board. Eliminates the provision allowing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 237
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 488: yeas 46, nays 4
2017-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehman, Cherry, Candelaria Reardon and Porter
2017-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Torr and Macer
2017-04-18SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-18SenateDissent withdrawn
2017-04-17SenateSenate advisors appointed: Hershman, Randolph Lonnie M and Sandlin
2017-04-17SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Stoops
2017-04-17SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-17SenateConcurrence withdrawn
2017-04-06SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2017-04-05SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-03-29HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-03-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 321: yeas 96, nays 0
2017-03-23HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2017-03-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-07HouseRepresentative Cherry added as cosponsor
2017-03-06HouseRepresentative Lehman added as cosponsor
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-17SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Torr
2017-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 48, nays 0
2017-02-14SenateAmendment #2 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-14SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-09SenateSenator Hershman added as second author
2017-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2017-01-17SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/507/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/f/c/07fc5b6d/SB0507.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/a/5/8fa56c45/SB0507.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/e/1/12e1d6b2/SB0507.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/6/5/8765816d/SB0507.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/8/d/fc8d738c/SB0507.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/a/4/caa460e7/SB0507.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/f/a/30fa5068/SB0507.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/c/e/41cedf33/SB0507.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/e/8/a1e87004/SB0507.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/0/a/e90a985e/SB0507.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/b/2/d0b20597/SB0507.135.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/3/e/e73ef1dd/SB0507.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/f/8/c2f8867d/SB0507.321.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/2/2/5922de8e/SB0507.488.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback