IN SB0506 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Suicide prevention programming. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to: (1) develop a statewide program for suicide prevention; and (2) employ a coordinator of the statewide program for suicide prevention. Requires the coordinator to study and determine: (1) the professions that should be required to receive training on suicide assessment, treatment, and management; and (2) the manner in which to fund the training. Requires the coordinator to report the determinations to the legislative council not later than December 31, 2017. Requires emergency medical services providers to complete an evidence based training program concerning suicide assessment, treatment, and management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suicide prevention programming. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to: (1) develop a statewide program for suicide prevention; and (2) employ a coordinator of the statewide program for suicide prevention. Requires the coordinator to study and determine: (1) the professions that should be required to receive training on suicide assessment, treatment, and management; and (2) the manner in which to fund the training. Requires the coordinator to report the determinations to the legislative council not later than December 31, 2017. Requires emergency medical services providers to complete an evidence based training program concerning suicide assessment, treatment, and management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2017-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Olthoff
2017-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 49, nays 0
2017-02-21SenateAmendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-21SenateAmendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-16SenateSenators Stoops, Leising, Grooms added as coauthors
2017-02-16SenateSenators Crider and Becker added as coauthors
2017-02-16SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2017-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-14SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2017-01-17SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback