IN SB0506 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person to carry a handgun without being licensed to carry a handgun if: (1) the person is in or on property, or in a vehicle, that is owned, leased, rented, or otherwise legally controlled by the person; (2) the person is lawfully present in or on private property that is owned, leased, rented, or otherwise legally controlled by another person, if the person has the consent of the owner to have the handgun on the premises, is attending a firearms related event, or is receiving firearms related services; (3) the person is lawfully present in a vehicle, that is owned, leased, rented, or otherwise legally controlled by another person; (4) the person is carrying the handgun at a shooting range, while attending a firearms instructional course, or while engaged in a legal hunting activity; or (5) the handgun is unloaded and securely wrapped. (Current law provides that a person who does not possess a valid handgun license may not carry a handgun in any vehicle or on or about the person's body unless the person: (1) is in the person's dwelling or fixed place of business or on the person's property; or (2) is carrying the handgun unloaded and in a secure wrapper from the place where the handgun was purchased to the person's dwelling or fixed place of business, between a handgun repair shop and the person's dwelling or fixed place of business, or from one dwelling or fixed place of business to another.) Specifies that a person who has been convicted of domestic battery may not possess or carry a handgun unless the person's right to possess a firearm has been restored by a court.
Title
Handgun possession.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 164 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-19 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 385: yeas 43, nays 4 | |
2011-04-14 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2011-04-13 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-13 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 528: yeas 84, nays 13 | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment 2 (DeLaney), failed; voice vote | |
2011-04-12 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-02-17 | Senators M. Young, Waterman and Holdman added as coauthors | |
2011-02-17 | Cosponsors: Reps. Eberhart and Morris | |
2011-02-17 | House sponsor: Rep. VanNatter | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-17 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 43, nays 7 | |
2011-02-17 | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed; voice vote | |
2011-02-15 | Amendment 1 (Taylor), failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 10, nays 36 | |
2011-02-15 | Amendment 7 (Tomes), prevailed; | |
2011-02-15 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-14 | Amendment 6 (Tomes), withdrawn | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: call withdrawn | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Senators Nugent, Smith, Schneider and Waltz added as coauthors | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-01-18 | Coauthored by Senator Banks | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Senators Tomes and Kruse |