IN SB0505 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Senator Waterman added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Senator Waterman added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any federal act, order, law, rule, regulation, or statute found by the general assembly to be inconsistent with the power granted to the federal government in the Constitution of the United States is void in Indiana. Provides that a resident of Indiana has a cause of action to enjoin the enforcement or implementation or the attempted enforcement or implementation of a federal act, order, law, rule, regulation, or statute declared void by the general assembly. Provides that a plaintiff who prevails in such an action is entitled to reasonable attorney fees and costs. Finds that the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the federal Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 are inconsistent with the power granted to the federal government in the Constitution of the United States.
Title
Applicability of federal law in Indiana.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. John Waterman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | Senator Waterman added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Senator Alting added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Steele added as coauthor | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Coauthored by Senator Banks | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Senators Tomes and Kruse |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0505 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0505.1.html |