IN SB0500 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Public Law 233
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education deregulation. Makes comprehensive revisions to the Indiana Code relating to all aspects of the administration of schools and school corporations and the education of students from pre-kindergarten through grade 12. Repeals various obsolete provisions and provisions that limit local control of schools. Establishes a school reporting oversight committee to review all reporting requirements by the state for schools. Makes conforming and technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education deregulation. Makes comprehensive revisions to the Indiana Code relating to all aspects of the administration of schools and school corporations and the education of students from pre-kindergarten through grade 12. Repeals various obsolete provisions and provisions that limit local control of schools. Establishes a school reporting oversight committee to review all reporting requirements by the state for schools. Makes conforming and technical amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House - Amendment #6 (Errington) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-13SenatePublic Law 233
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 412: yeas 36, nays 13
2015-04-01SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-01HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-03-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 359: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-03-30HouseAmendment #6 (Errington) failed; Roll Call 334: yeas 28, nays 65
2015-03-30HouseAmendment #1 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote
2015-03-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-03-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-12HouseRepresentatives McNamara, Truitt, Goodin added as cosponsorss
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-24SenateRepresentative Cook added as sponsor
2015-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 261: yeas 31, nays 18
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #6 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #7 (Hershman) failed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #9 (Lanane) failed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #4 (Banks A) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #8 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #10 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-23SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2015-01-29SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Pete

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/500/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/a/3/f7a3b2a7/SB0500.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/6/f/566fc984/SB0500.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/1/c/db1c9acc/SB0500.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/c/c/8cccc6fd/SB0500.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/4/4/b5448e35/SB0500.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/f/4/e6f4ee73/SB0500.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/8/d/d68dc32d/SB0500.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/9/9/4999d4f0/SB0500.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/d/a/41da0c3e/SB0500.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/1/1/4f117bab/SB0500.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/3/3/b233095e/SB0500.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/c/e/12ce76e5/SB0500.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/d/6/5ad62a34/SB0500.07.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/d/3/fad39ce4/SB0500.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/a/c/74acbae7/SB0500.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/6/0/2360d629/SB0500.261.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/5/2/5f528596/SB0500.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/f/e/87feefe1/SB0500.334.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/2/b/dd2bd04b/SB0500.359.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/b/e/d5bea2c0/SB0500.412.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback