IN SB0500 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Residential settings for developmentally disabled individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential settings for developmentally disabled individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 130
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-10HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-04-10HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 459: yeas 93, nays 0
2013-04-09HouseRepresentative C. Brown added as cosponsor
2013-04-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-02HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2013-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Clere
2013-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-04SenateSenator Stoops added as second author
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Pat Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback