IN SB0499 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts from participation in the public employees' defined contribution plan (annuity savings account only plan) (plan) and the retirement medical benefits account (account) within the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) employees of the state who are employed by: (1) a body corporate and politic of the state created by state statute; or (2) a state educational institution; unless the chief executive officer of the body or institution elects to participate in the plan or the account by submitting a written notice of the election to the director of the Indiana public retirement system (system). Provides that the board of trustees of the system (board) shall grant service credit to a participant who withdrew from the prosecuting attorneys retirement fund (fund) for years of service accrued before the withdrawal if the participant pays into the fund the full amount of the money received when the participant withdrew, plus interest at a rate specified by rule by the board. Establishes the amount of the PERF pension offset for a participant (and the surviving spouse and dependent child of a participant) in the fund who is also a member of the plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERF and prosecutor pension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 54
2013-04-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-25SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-19HouseRepresentative Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2013-03-19HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 97, nays 0
2013-03-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-12HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseRepresentatives Gutwein and Harman added as cosponsors
2013-02-26HouseRepresentative McMillin added as sponsor
2013-02-26HouseRepresentative Harman removed as cosponsor
2013-02-26HouseRepresentative Gutwein removed as sponsor
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2013-02-05SenateSenator Buck added as third author
2013-02-05SenateCosponsor: Rep. Harman
2013-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Gutwein
2013-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-02-04SenateSenator Boots added as second author
2013-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback