IN SB0498 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher compensation. Provides that certain factors may account for not more than 33.33% (instead of 33%) of the calculation used to determine a teacher's increase or increment in salary. Amends the factor concerning additional content area degrees and credit hours in determining a teacher's increase or increment in salary. Requires the department of education to grant an application to add an additional content area or areas to a valid Indiana teaching license if certain conditions apply.
Title
Teacher compensation. Provides that certain factors may account for not more than 33.33% (instead of 33%) of the calculation used to determine a teacher's increase or increment in salary. Amends the factor concerning additional content area degrees and credit hours in determining a teacher's increase or increment in salary. Requires the department of education to grant an application to add an additional content area or areas to a valid Indiana teaching license if certain conditions apply.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Rep. Greg Beumer [R] | Rep. Richard Hamm [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Law 216 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 385: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment #3 (Smith V) motion withdrawn voice vote |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Representative Cook added as cosponsor |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Beumer and Hamm |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wesco |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |