IN SB0496 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Representative Austin added as cosponsor
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Voluntary family leave insurance program. Requires the department of insurance (department) to develop a proposal for a voluntary family leave program. Provides for certain provisions when developing the proposed program. Provides that the department shall study and make fiscal estimates about the costs of offering an employer tax deduction of 200% to small businesses who choose to pay all or part of the contribution. Requires the department to submit the proposed program to the budget committee, including projected costs of the program, for review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary family leave insurance program. Requires the department of insurance (department) to develop a proposal for a voluntary family leave program. Provides for certain provisions when developing the proposed program. Provides that the department shall study and make fiscal estimates about the costs of offering an employer tax deduction of 200% to small businesses who choose to pay all or part of the contribution. Requires the department to submit the proposed program to the budget committee, including projected costs of the program, for review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseRepresentative Austin added as cosponsor
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-18SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateCosponsors: Representatives Moseley and Schaibley
2019-02-18SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
2019-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 30, nays 19
2019-02-14SenateThird reading: call withdrawn
2019-02-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-11SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateSenators Ford J.D., Niezgodski, Walker, Doriot added as coauthors
2019-02-07SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-05SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Ford Jon added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenators Becker and Breaux added as coauthors
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senators Tallian and Ruckelshaus

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback