IN SB0496 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that ephedrine or pseudoephedrine may be sold only by a pharmacy or a retailer that uses the NPLEx tracking system. Allows a retailer who: (1) does not use the NPLEx tracking system; and (2) meets certain other requirements; to sell ephedrine or pseudoephedrine in convenience packages until January 1, 2014. Provides that: (1) a pharmacy may not sell more than 61.2 grams of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine to an individual in a 365 day period; and (2) an individual may not purchase more than 61.2 grams of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine in a 365 day period. Prohibits a person convicted of certain offenses involving methamphetamine from possessing ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, or phenylpropanolamine within seven years of the person's conviction, unless dispensed under a prescription. Increases the penalty for furnishing methamphetamine precursors to another person with knowledge that the recipient will use the precursors to manufacture a controlled substance if the person furnishes more than 10 grams of certain precursors. Removes a provision requiring certain signage where ephedrine or pseudoephedrine is sold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Control of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 193
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-16SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 487: yeas 43, nays 5
2013-04-15SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-25HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 331: yeas 91, nays 1
2013-03-21HouseAmendment 1 (Bacon), failed; voice vote
2013-03-21HouseAmendment 2 (McMillin), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2013-02-12SenateSenators Steele and Kruse added as coauthors
2013-02-11SenateCosponsors: Reps. Steuerwald and Lawson
2013-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. McMillin
2013-02-11SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 44 and nays 4
2013-02-07SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c) technical corrections.
2013-02-05SenateAmendment 1 (Tallian), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-05SenateAmendment 2 (Yoder), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-29SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2013-01-22SenateSenator M. Young added as second author
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Yoder

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback