IN SB0494 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Substitute natural gas.
Title
Substitute natural gas.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Lindel Hume [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] |
Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Scott Schneider [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-27 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Moseley), failed (Y: 30 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Moseley), failed (Y: 30 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 228 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-27 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 665: yeas 70, nays 28 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 585: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative Koch added as conferee |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative Koch removed as House advisor |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative Battles removed as conferee |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as conferee |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator Hershman removed as advisor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as conferee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senator Hume added as advisor |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as conferee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senator Skinner removed as advisor |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senator Hume removed as conferee |
2013-04-22 | House | Representatives Ubelhor, Koch, VanDenburgh, Pierce and Hale appointed as House advisors |
2013-04-22 | House | Representatives Heuer, Saunders, Niezgodski, Klinker and Goodin removed as House advisors |
2013-04-22 | House | Representatives Crouch and Battles added as conferees |
2013-04-22 | House | Representative T. Brown and Porter removed as conferees |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as advisor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as conferee |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senator Hershman removed as conferee |
2013-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Heuer, Saunders, Niezgodski, Klinker and Goodin |
2013-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: T. Brown and Porter |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Mishler, Skinner and Schneider |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Hershman and Hume |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 458: yeas 90, nays 4 |
2013-04-08 | House | Representative Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2013-04-04 | House | Representative Heuer added as cosponsor |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment 5 (Clere), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment 7 (Harman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment 3 (Moseley), failed; Roll Call 403: yeas 30, nays 58 |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment 6 (Saunders), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Representative Turner added as cosponsor |
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as coauthor |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as coauthor |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senator Hume added as coauthor |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |