IN SB0491 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Funding for veterans programs. Extends to 2021 the veterans pilot program that provides assistance for certain providers to provide diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment to veterans. (Under current law, the program expires June 30, 2020.) Eliminates the requirement that a veteran must pay a co-pay equal to 10% of the cost of treatment billed to the Indiana department of veterans' affairs (department) or the state department of health for diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment. Provides that an individual veteran may not be required to pay a co-pay under the program. Voids the rule of state department of health defining "co-pay" for purposes of the program. Requires the state department of health to adopt emergency rules to amend specified existing program rules to do the following: (1) Remove the requirement that a veteran must pay a co-pay equal to 10% of the cost of treatment billed to the department. (2) Provide that grants may not be made under the program after June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding for veterans programs. Extends to 2021 the veterans pilot program that provides assistance for certain providers to provide diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment to veterans. (Under current law, the program expires June 30, 2020.) Eliminates the requirement that a veteran must pay a co-pay equal to 10% of the cost of treatment billed to the Indiana department of veterans' affairs (department) or the state department of health for diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment. Provides that an individual veteran may not be required to pay a co-pay under the program. Voids the rule of state department of health defining "co-pay" for purposes of the program. Requires the state department of health to adopt emergency rules to amend specified existing program rules to do the following: (1) Remove the requirement that a veteran must pay a co-pay equal to 10% of the cost of treatment billed to the department. (2) Provide that grants may not be made under the program after June 30, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenatePublic Law 156
2019-05-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 549: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-18SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 399: yeas 89, nays 1
2019-04-01HouseAmendment #1 (Frye R) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-28HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-03-04HouseRepresentative Bartels added as cosponsor
2019-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-25SenateCosponsor: Representative Gutwein
2019-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frye R
2019-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-21SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-14SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenators Boots, Merritt, Doriot added as coauthors
2019-01-24SenateSenator Sandlin added as third author
2019-01-24SenateSenator Garten added as second author
2019-01-22SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/491/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/9/0/9a903061/SB0491.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/a/3/d5a3922b/SB0491.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/0/6/1c06ce42/SB0491.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/4/0/0a4046b5/SB0491.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/a/e09a1f0d/SB0491.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/c/f/73cf574b/SB0491.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/f/2/85f23a98/SB0491.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/a/7/eba72c49/SB0491.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/4/6/fc468ea4/SB0491.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/7/3/10734397/SB0491.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/b/d/0ebd04ea/SB0491.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/b/4/12b49b32/SB0491.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/f/e/7dfe9fca/SB0491.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/9/3/44938034/SB0491.195.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/3/7/9537a671/SB0491.03.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/a/4/fba42c82/SB0491.399.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/7/7/0977fd87/SB0491.549.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback