IN SB0490 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals all noncode statutes enacted after the 1984 regular session of the general assembly and before the 2010 regular session, except certain specifically preserved noncode statutes. Codifies other noncode provisions. Establishes general rules relating to the operation of legislative study commissions and committees. Relocates the statute establishing the criminal law and sentencing policy study committee. Repeals the statute enacted for temporary legislative study committees. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the code revision commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noncode statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 220
2011-05-13 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-05 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-05 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-05-05 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-29 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2011-04-29 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2011-04-28 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 485: yeas 48, nays 0
2011-04-27 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 451: yeas 84, nays 5
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (Foley), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 49, nays 0
2011-02-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-17 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-13 Authored by Senators Holdman, Delph and Taylor

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback