IN SB0489 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-19 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-19 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Machine guns; firearm safety guide. Revises, for purposes of an enhancement and certain criminal offenses, a definition of "machine gun" to include a particular part or combination of parts designed and intended for use in converting a weapon into a weapon that fires automatically more than one shot, without manual reloading, by a single function of the trigger. Modifies a separate definition of "machine gun". Requires the state police department to create a firearm safety guide (guide) that includes certain information before September 1, 2023, and to deliver the guide to each retail dealer located in Indiana before October 1, 2023. After November 1, 2023, requires a retail dealer to provide a copy of the guide to the recipient of a firearm at the time the retail dealer completes a firearm sale, rental, trade, or transfer.
Title
Machine guns; firearm safety guide.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Authored by Senator Breaux |
Subjects
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/senate/489/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/senate/489/#1.INTR |